Menard, Inc. v. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Plaintiff: Menard, Inc.
Defendant: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02746
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC by Trevor J Illes (Illes, Trevor)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC by Mark Stephen Eisen (Eisen, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC by David S. Almeida (Almeida, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to 7/5/2019 to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Joint status report is now due 8/5/2019. The 7/2/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. No appearance is required on 6/6/2019. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by David S. Almeida for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Almeida, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED (Almeida, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Menard, Inc. regarding Complaint served on Derrick Hackett of CT Corporation on May 16, 2019 (Mitchell, Joseph)
May 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC (mc, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Joint status report due by 6/27/2019. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/3/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jjr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mitchell, Joseph)
April 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MENARD, INC.,; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15750558.(Mitchell, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menard, Inc. v. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Trevor J Illes
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Represented By: Mark Stephen Eisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?