Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Mylan Inc., Pfizer Inc., Amgen Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd and Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02799
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: This case has been consolidated into Case No. 19-cv-1873 for all further purposes and is administratively closed. Any future filings shall be made in Case No. 19-cv-1873. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/2/2019. (rp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd, AbbVie Inc. by Diana M. Watral (Watral, Diana)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd, AbbVie Inc. by James F. Hurst (Hurst, James)
April 29, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AbbVie Inc., Amgen Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc. (ec, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund by Brian M. Hogan (Hogan, Brian)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund by Robert J. Wozniak (Wozniak, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund by Steven A Kanner (Kanner, Steven)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund by Michael Jerry Freed (Freed, Michael)
April 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Freed, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15759821. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Freed, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Steven A Kanner
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?