Sheldons', Inc. v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Sheldons', Inc. and Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv02886
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER : Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/13/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 6/13/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of preliminary injunction #23 is granted. Status hearings set for 6/20/2019 and 7/3/2019 are stricken and re-set to 7/16/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. (Gulbransen, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheldons', Inc. as to Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Gulbransen, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #23 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/13/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Sheldons', Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gulbransen, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 6/11/2019 is stricken and re-set to 6/20/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Sheldons', Inc. (Document not scanned). (ew, )
May 29, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant yoursfsfashionjewelryltd and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint (mc, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 5/28/2019. TRO is extended to 6/11/2019. Status hearing set for 6/11/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice(mc, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 5/14/2019. Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion for entry of a (1) Temporary Restraining Order, (2) Asset Restraining Order, (3) expedited discovery order, and (4) service of process by email #8 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for leave to temporarily seal documents #12 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Proposed TRO Order to be submitted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (gcy, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. by Dustin S. Fisher (Fisher, Dustin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #8 , motion to seal document #12 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/14/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. to seal document sealed document #7 , sealed document #11 (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Sheldons', Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Sheldon, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. for temporary restraining order (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. (Gulbransen, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 7/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
April 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure by Sheldons', Inc. (Gulbransen, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheldons', Inc. by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr (Gulbransen, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gulbransen, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 USPTO Cover Sheet by Sheldons', Inc. (Gulbransen, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sheldons', Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15772165. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gulbransen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheldons', Inc. v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldons', Inc.
Represented By: David Lee Gulbransen, Jr
Represented By: Dustin S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?