Casey v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Casey
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02912
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Deborah Share of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. (Share, Deborah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.(Wolfe, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Timothy Alan Wolfe of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. (Wolfe, Timothy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jennifer Casey. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Chaet, Aaron)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Casey by Kerry Evan Saltzman (Saltzman, Kerry)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Casey by Aaron W. Chaet (Chaet, Aaron)
April 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chaet, Aaron)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint filed by Jennifer Casey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15775324.(Chaet, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Share
Represented By: Timothy Alan Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Casey
Represented By: Aaron W. Chaet
Represented By: Kerry Evan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?