Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-17

Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Defendant: DOES 1-17 and Doe #4
Case Number: 1:2019cv02927
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 7/3/2019. Status hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 11 (Hierl, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant No. 4 (Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion to take discovery prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #9 is granted. No appearance is required on 5/20/2019. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery #9 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. in support of motion for discovery #9 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 7/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Registration Numbers) (tt, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15776796. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?