Cohan v. Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC

Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC and Cambria Hotel
Case Number: 1:2019cv02946
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 7/26/2019. Motion hearing date of 6/13/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/18/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Brenna R. Mclean for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #7 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/13/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Mclean, Brenna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Mclean, Brenna)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC by Brenna R. Mclean (Mclean, Brenna)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Cohan as to Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Burt, Marshall)
May 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC (mc, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 7/18/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15780780.(Burt, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated 32 West Randolph, LLC
Represented By: Brenna R. Mclean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambria Hotel
Represented By: Brenna R. Mclean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Marshall J. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?