Cohan v. Naperville Hotel Partners LLC

Plaintiff: Robert M Kaplan and Howard M Cohan
Defendant: Naperville Hotel Partners LLC d/b/a Embassy Suites by Hilton Chicago Naperville and Naperville Hotel Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02992
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing held on 6/26/2019. Parties not present in Court. Status hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. Parties are ordered to be present at the next hearing. Failure to appear may result in sanctions. Plaintiff is advised that such sanctions may include dismissal of the case for want of prosecution. Mailed notice (is, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 6/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
May 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard M Cohan by Robert Michael Kaplan (Kaplan, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard M Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15787183. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Naperville Hotel Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard M Cohan
Represented By: Robert Michael Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naperville Hotel Partners LLC d/b/a Embassy Suites by Hilton Chicago Naperville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naperville Hotel Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?