Triestman v. Turkheimer
Plaintiff: Peter Treistman and Peter Triestman
Defendant: Deborah Turkheimer
Case Number: 1:2019cv03081
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deborah Turkheimer by Adam Ivan Rich (Rich, Adam)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deborah Turkheimer by Jacqueline A, Giannini (Giannini, Jacqueline)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Deborah Turkheimer. Deborah Turkheimer waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Strom, Rachel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deborah Turkheimer by Rachel Fan Stern Strom (Strom, Rachel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deborah Turkheimer by Natalie J. Spears (Spears, Natalie)
May 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Triestman by Steven Russell Smith (Smith, Steven)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peter Triestman by Steven Russell Smith (Smith, Steven)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Steven)
May 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Peter Treistman; Jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15798761.(Smith, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triestman v. Turkheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Turkheimer
Represented By: Jacqueline A, Giannini
Represented By: Rachel Fan Stern Strom
Represented By: Adam Ivan Rich
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Treistman
Represented By: Steven Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Triestman
Represented By: Steven Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?