Kowalski v. Paloian
Appellee: Gus A. Paloian
Appellant: Jan Kowalski
Case Number: 1:2019cv03098
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff filed eleven appeals of the same order and filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis in only one case, 19-cv-2126 17 . The Court denies appellant's petition to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/6/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 31, 2019 FINAL closing order dated 5/30/2019 entered on USBC docket. (las, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 5/30/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court dismisses the appeal in case no. 19-cv-3098 and closes the case. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/30/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #4 ; USCA Case No. 19-2025 (nsf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #4 . Notified counsel. (sxb, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #4 (sxb, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appeal by Jan Kowalski regarding order #3 (Envelope postmarked 5/23/2019; Institutional postmark 5/23/2019). (sxb, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2126, In Re: Kowalski, and the Hon. Mary M. Rowland as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2126, In Re: Kowalski, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Rowland shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Case# Case Title 19 CV 2128 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2131 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2132 Kowalski v. Gus A Paloian; 19 CV 2133 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2557 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2812 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2888 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 2889 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 3041 Kowalski v. Paloian; 19 CV 3098 Kowalski v. Paloian Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/20/2019. (ph, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #1 letter) (nsf, ).
May 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 66 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter NOA, #2 Adv Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Paloian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gus A. Paloian
Represented By: Devvrat Vikram Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jan Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?