K. et al v. Board of Education of City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Deborah K., A. K. and David K.
Defendant: Board of Education of City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2019cv03199
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. The filing of Defendant's response is stayed. Status hearing set for 8/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 6/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 23, 2019 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 34841. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of City of Chicago by Kathleen Marie Gibbons (Gibbons, Kathleen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #4 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Deborah K., A. K., David K.. All Defendants. (Dembs, Bradley)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Dembs for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #4 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Dembs, Bradley)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Dembs for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #4 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Dembs, Bradley)
May 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dembs, Bradley)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiffs A. K., David K., Deborah K. for preliminary injunction and Memorandum in Support (Dembs, Bradley)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs A. K., David K., Deborah K. by Bradley Joseph Dembs (Dembs, Bradley)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs A. K., David K., Deborah K. by Matthew David Cohen (Cohen, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deborah K., A. K., David K.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15814998. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K. et al v. Board of Education of City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah K.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of City of Chicago
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?