United States of Amercia v. Funds in the Amount of $884,630
Plaintiff: United States of Amercia
Defendant: Funds in the Amount of $884,630
Claimant: Max Hartman
Case Number: 1:2019cv03215
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report by United States of Amercia (Hayes, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Max Hartman(Barnett, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 WITHDRAWING Jeffrey Borup as counsel for Plaintiff United States of Amercia and substituting Brian Hayes as counsel of record (Hayes, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Max Hartman by L. Felipe Sanchez (Sanchez, L.) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem Returned Executed on 6/12/19 as to Funds in the amount of $884,630. (Attachments: #1 USM285 - verified complaint for forfeiture)(kp, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15925531. (Barnett, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Max Hartman by Richard M Barnett (Barnett, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Max Hartman regarding complaint #1 (Barnett, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing is set for 7/12/219 at 9:00 AM. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report at least 3 days prior to the status in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consentto proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction regarding #4 . (ph, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR (ph, ) Modified on 5/14/2019 (ph, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ISSUED ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued as to FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $884,630. (ph, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Jeffrey Ryan Borup as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of Amercia (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of Amercia; (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of Amercia v. Funds in the Amount of $884,630
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the Amount of $884,630
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of Amercia
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Borup
Represented By: Brian Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Max Hartman
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Represented By: L. Felipe Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?