Fox v. Fifth Third Bank et al

Plaintiff: Omar Fox
Defendant: Fifth Third Mortgage Company, Fifth Third Home Lending Corp., Fifth Third Bank, Peter Andreotti, Fifth Third Holdings, LLC and Fifth Third A Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03232
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Fifth Third A Corp., Fifth Third Bank, Fifth Third Holdings, LLC, Fifth Third Home Lending Corp., Fifth Third Mortgage Company by Emery K. Harlan (Harlan, Emery)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the 7/15/2019 deadline for responsive pleadings, the status hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS Report (JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT) by Omar Fox (Raimond, Johanna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Fox. Fifth Third A Corp. waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Fifth Third Bank waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Fifth Third Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Fifth Third Home Lending Corp. waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Raimond, Johanna)
June 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued to two addresses as to Defendant Peter Andreotti. (ecw, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
May 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Raimond, Johanna)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Omar Fox; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15820669.(Raimond, Johanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Fox
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Mortgage Company
Represented By: Emery K. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Home Lending Corp.
Represented By: Emery K. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Emery K. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Andreotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Emery K. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third A Corp.
Represented By: Emery K. Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?