Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Kidder
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Arthur H. Bunte, Jr and Charles A. Whobrey
Defendant: Connie Kidder
Case Number: 1:2019cv03240
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Kate McMahon for presentment of motion for entry of default,, motion for default judgment, #12 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/18/2019 at 10:30 AM. (McMahon, Rebecca)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey for default judgment as to Connie Kidder (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rodriguez, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Affidavit McMahon, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(McMahon, Rebecca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion to substitute party #9 is granted. The Clerk's office is directed to substitute Charles A. Whobrey, Trustee, for Arthur H. Bunte, Jr. Motion hearing date of 6/13/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Kate McMahon for presentment of motion to substitute party #9 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/13/2019 at 10:30 AM. (McMahon, Rebecca)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Arthur H. Bunte, Jr, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund to substitute party (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Arthur H. Bunte, Jr as to Connie Kidder on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arthur H. Bunte, Jr, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Caitlin Maria McNulty (McNulty, Caitlin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 7/18/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arthur H. Bunte, Jr, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Robert Anthony Coco (Coco, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arthur H. Bunte, Jr, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Timothy Craig Reuter (Reuter, Timothy)
May 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Connie Kidder (rc, )
May 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arthur H. Bunte, Jr, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund by Rebecca Kate McMahon (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Arthur H. Bunte, Jr; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15821912. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McMahon, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Timothy Craig Reuter
Represented By: Robert Anthony Coco
Represented By: Rebecca Kate McMahon
Represented By: Caitlin Maria McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur H. Bunte, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Craig Reuter
Represented By: Robert Anthony Coco
Represented By: Rebecca Kate McMahon
Represented By: Caitlin Maria McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey
Represented By: Timothy Craig Reuter
Represented By: Robert Anthony Coco
Represented By: Rebecca Kate McMahon
Represented By: Caitlin Maria McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?