Mohammed v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Hares Mohammed
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv03258
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: At the request of counsel, the status hearing set for 7/10/19 is reset to 7/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Hares Mohammed. The Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Akrap, Mirko)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hares Mohammed by Mirko Akrap (Akrap, Mirko)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to The Prudential Insurance Company of America on 5/15/2019 by Plaintiff Hares Mohammed. Waiver of service due by 6/14/2019. (Bartolic, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 7/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
May 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hares Mohammed by Michael Bartolic (Bartolic, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bartolic, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hares Mohammed; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15824738. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 Benefit Termination Letter 11/27/18, #4 Exhibit 3 Final Denial 3/6/19)(Bartolic, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hares Mohammed
Represented By: Michael Bartolic
Represented By: Mirko Akrap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?