Guzman v. Alpie, INC.

Plaintiff: Ivan Guzman
Defendant: Alpie, INC, f/k/a Al Piemonte, INC an Illinois corporation and Alpie, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03310
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: By agreement, status hearing set for 8/15/19 is stricken and re-set to 8/13/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted to and including 8/2/19. Motion hearing date of 7/9/19 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 8/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the courts Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alpie, Inc. by Ira M. Levin (Levin, Ira)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alpie, Inc. by Elizabeth Meyer Pall Amended (Pall, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Meyer Pall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/9/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Pall, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Alpie, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Pall, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alpie, Inc. by Elizabeth Meyer Pall (Pall, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ivan Guzman by Eugene K. Hollander (Hollander, Eugene)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ivan Guzman by Jonathon Lamont Hoeven (Hoeven, Jonathon)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ivan Guzman by Paul W. Ryan (Ryan, Paul)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hollander, Eugene)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ivan Guzman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15834043.(Hollander, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Alpie, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpie, INC, f/k/a Al Piemonte, INC an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpie, Inc.
Represented By: Ira M. Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth Meyer Pall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Guzman
Represented By: Paul W. Ryan
Represented By: Jonathon Lamont Hoeven
Represented By: Eugene K. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?