Vaitiekunaite v. Barr et al

Plaintiff: Rita VAITIEKUNAITE and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Defendant: Thomas CHIOPPA, Attorney General William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, US Attorney's Office and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv03330
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendants' agreed motion to remand #7 is granted. This case is remanded to the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services to issue a decision on Plaintiff's naturalization application within the next 30 days. This remand is without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing any available administrative and judicial remedies in the event of an adverse decision. Motion hearing set for 7/1/2019 #8 is stricken. The status hearing set for 7/1/2019 #5 is stricken. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion to remand #7 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Oswald, Craig)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants William Barr, Thomas Chioppa, Kevin McAleenan to remand (Oswald, Craig)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Thomas Chioppa, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to William Barr, Thomas CHIOPPA, Kevin McAleenan, US Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney. (daj, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rita VAITIEKUNAITE by Brent Kelly Newcomb (Newcomb, Brent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Newcomb, Brent)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rita VAITIEKUNAITE; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15836304.(Newcomb, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaitiekunaite v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita VAITIEKUNAITE
Represented By: Brent Kelly Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas CHIOPPA
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?