Hearn v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Hearn
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv03346
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing is set for 7/19/2019 at 9:30 AM to determine whether plaintiff will be continuing to pursue this case. If plaintiff does not appear, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 6/7/2019 as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . The application is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #8 is set for 6/7/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Hearn for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Hearn (sxb, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Gwendolyn Hearn (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearn v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?