United States Liability Insurance Company v. Nunez et al
Plaintiff: United States Liability Insurance Company
Defendant: Kikas Construction, Inc., Lucy Ontiveros, Jorge Ontiveros, Manuel Nunez and Little Explorers Learning Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03354
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's uncontested motion for continuance of initial status conference #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/16/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the next status hearing, the hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice (mw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company to continue Initial Status Conference (Logan, William)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion by William F. Logan for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15903144. (Logan, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/16/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/9/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States Liability Insurance Company by Scott D Hofer (Hofer, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hofer, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT regarding #1 of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840302. (Hofer, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by United States Liability Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy CL 1719379)(Hofer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Liability Insurance Company v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kikas Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Explorers Learning Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott D Hofer
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: William Francis Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?