Ward-Jones v. Amsted Industries, Inc.,

Plaintiff: Lyndsey Ward-Jones
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc. and Amsted Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03356
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 11, 2019 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 35363. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement plaintiff's motion to amend instanter #21 is denied as moot. Defendants' motion for an enlargement of time within which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs first amended complaint by 7/30/2019 #24 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Jane M. McFetridge for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #24 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McFetridge, Jane)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #23 Defendants' Motion for an Enlargement of TIme within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McFetridge, Jane)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 First AMENDED complaint by Lyndsey Ward-Jones against Amsted Industries, Inc. et al (Kane, Lisa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Lisa R. Kane for presentment of motion to supplement, #21 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kane, Lisa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to supplement Instanter Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kane, Lisa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. Redacted-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 (McFetridge, Jane)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the named parties listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #15 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE NAMED PARTIES LISTED IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 20, 2019 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 35128. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Lisa R. Kane for presentment of motion to amend/correct #15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kane, Lisa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kane, Lisa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Fact discovery is ordered closed by 12/17/2019. Status hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amsted Industries, Inc. LOCAL RULE 3.2 AND FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT BURGESS-NORTON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. (McFetridge, Jane)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Amsted Industries, Inc.(McFetridge, Jane)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond by 6/19/2019 #10 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/11/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #9 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Jane M. McFetridge for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McFetridge, Jane)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Nicky M Priovolos (Priovolos, Nicky)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones as to Amsted Industries, Inc. on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Kane, Lisa)
May 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. (rc, )
May 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lyndsey Ward-Jones by Lisa R. Kane (Kane, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lyndsey Ward-Jones; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840233.(Kane, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward-Jones v. Amsted Industries, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndsey Ward-Jones
Represented By: Lisa R. Kane
Represented By: Nicky M Priovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?