BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Meeks
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Kirke S. Meeks
Case Number: 1:2019cv03393
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Marmor, Sarah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kirke S. Meeks(Roche, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Due to scheduling conflict of the Court, status hearing set for 7/25/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/31/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 6/26/19. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by Suzanne Milne Alexander (Alexander, Suzanne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Michael T Roche for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/13/2019 at 01:45 PM. (Roche, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Kirke S. Meeks for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Roche, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kirke S. Meeks by Patrick Michael Spellman (Spellman, Patrick)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kirke S. Meeks by Michael T Roche (Roche, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/25/2019 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/18/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file complaint under seal #5 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to Kirke S. Meeks on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Marmor, Sarah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah R. Marmor for presentment of motion for leave to file #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/29/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Marmor, Sarah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
May 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. for leave to file Under Seal Unredacted Complaint [Dkt. 4] (Marmor, Sarah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. Unredacted Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marmor, Sarah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marmor, Sarah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BMO Harris Bank N.A. re complaint #1 (Marmor, Sarah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15845393. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marmor, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirke S. Meeks
Represented By: Patrick Michael Spellman
Represented By: Michael T Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Sarah R. Marmor
Represented By: Suzanne Milne Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?