Emmanuel v. The Social Table
Plaintiff: Adewale Emmanuel
Defendant: The Social Table
Case Number: 1:2019cv03398
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED, for document #4 sent to Adewale Emmanuel returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Plaintiff provided an email address on their Pro Se Appearance Form. Entries have been regenerated to that email address. (mma, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has to June 13, 2019 in which to pay the filing fee or submit the application. Failure to do so will result in this action being dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Adewale Emmanuel. (nsf, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Adewale Emmanuel. (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel v. The Social Table
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Social Table
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adewale Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?