Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments v. State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments
Defendant: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03449
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: No appearances are necessary on 7/17/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY by State National Insurance Company, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #20 Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Prejudgment Interest (Chacon, Zacarias)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartmentsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc. to strike Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Prejudgment Interest #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Eshoo, Edward)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 10/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by 1/31/2020. Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to strike Plaintiff's prayer for prejudgment interest #16 is taken under advisement; response is due 7/8/2019; reply is due 7/15/2019; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. If at any time the parties jointly wish to have a settlement conference, they shall contact the Court's Courtroom Deputy for a referral to Magistrate Judge Schenkier. Notice of motion date of 7/17/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Amended Notice of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Prejudgment Interest NOTICE of Motion by Zacarias R. Chacon for presentment of motion to strike #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Chacon, Zacarias)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Prejudgment Interest NOTICE of Motion by Zacarias R. Chacon for presentment of motion to strike #16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Chacon, Zacarias)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc. to strike Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Prejudgment Interest (Chacon, Zacarias)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint by State National Insurance Company, Inc.(Chacon, Zacarias)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report (Joint) by Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments (Eshoo, Edward)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. Notice of motion date of 6/4/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments (Eshoo, Edward)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 (Notice of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint) NOTICE of Motion by Zacarias R. Chacon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/4/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Chacon, Zacarias)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Chacon, Zacarias)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/1/2019 at 9:15 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments by Christina M. Phillips (Phillips, Christina)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments by Edward Eshoo, Jr (Eshoo, Edward)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
May 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure of Corporate Interest Pursuant to FRCP Rule 7.1 by State National Insurance Company, Inc. (Chacon, Zacarias)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chacon, Zacarias)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc. by Zacarias R. Chacon Defendant State National Insurance Company, Inc.'s Appearance (Chacon, Zacarias)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 004273) filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15855364. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chacon, Zacarias)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments v. State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schopf Properties LLC, Series Apartments
Represented By: Christina M. Phillips
Represented By: Edward Eshoo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Zacarias R. Chacon, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?