C.M v. Aetna Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C. M.
Defendant: MHNet Behavioral Health Inc., Coventry Healthcare of Illinois Inc., Coventry Healthcare Inc. and Aetna Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03454
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aetna Inc., Coventry Healthcare Inc., Coventry Healthcare of Illinois Inc., MHNet Behavioral Health Inc. by Craig A Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jacobson, Craig)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by C. M.. All Defendants. (Carey, Michelle)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Gregory)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff C. M. by Michelle Lee Carey (Carey, Michelle)
May 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff C. M. by Gregory A. Friedman (Friedman, Gregory)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Gregory)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by C. M.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15855706. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Friedman, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.M v. Aetna Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHNet Behavioral Health Inc.
Represented By: Craig A Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Healthcare of Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Craig A Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Craig A Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc.
Represented By: Craig A Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. M.
Represented By: Gregory A. Friedman
Represented By: Michelle Lee Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?