Woods v. Stateville Corrections
Plaintiff: Dennis Marlon Woods
Defendant: Stateville Corrections and Stateville Correctional Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv03499
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 , considered with data from Plaintiff's application in Case No. 19 C 3501, is granted. The filing fee is waived. This case, however, is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking to pursue his intended claims against appropriate defendants in a proper judicial district. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this case. Case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/4/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 4, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ym, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman and designated Magistrate Judge Valdez for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/2019.(pk, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Dennis Marlon Woods for attorney representation (rp, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dennis Marlon Woods for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (rp, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Dennis Marlon Woods (rp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Envelope not post marked) (rp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Stateville Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Marlon Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?