Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.79.128.111
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.79.128.111
Case Number: 1:2019cv03507
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. Such early discovery is generally allowed only under limited circumstances. See, e.g., Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d); Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Does 128, No. 14 C 4927, 2014 WL 3642163, at *2 (N.D. Ill. July 22, 2014). Here, the Court finds that good cause exists to allow Plaintiff to obtain discovery prior to the conference. Plaintiff may cause to be issued a subpoena to the ISP that provided internet service to the defendant identified by the referenced IP address in order to obtain information regarding that defendant's name and address. This order is without prejudice to the defendant or ISP moving to quash the subpoena on any available ground. The 6/13/19 notice of motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/13/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/19. (tt, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Registration Numbers) (tt, )
May 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15863868. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.79.128.111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.79.128.111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?