Kowalski v. Paloian
Appellee: Gus A. Paloian
Appellant: Jan Kowalski
Case Number: 1:2019cv03554
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED, for document #3 sent to Jan Kowalski returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (sxb, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter ROA, #2 Adv Docket Sheet)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a) requires the appellant to file its opening brief within 14 days after the entry of the appeal on the docket. The appellant shall serve and file the opening brief by 7/5/2019. The appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 7/19/2019. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 8/2/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 (ym, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Rule 8010(3))(mc, )
May 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 66 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter NOA, #2 Deficient Form, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Paloian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gus A. Paloian
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Represented By: Devvrat Vikram Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jan Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?