Sklarsky et al v. Indigo Real Estate Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Kenvin, Susan Cook and Laura Sklarsky
Defendant: Standard Maple Owner, LLC, Apartment Management Consultants, LLC and Indigo Real Estate Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03680
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:The status hearing set for 8/15/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/14/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laura Sklarsky, Susan Cook, Natalie Kenvin. Indigo Real Estate Services, Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Rosenberg, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 8/12/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 8/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (rao, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laura Sklarsky, Susan Cook, Natalie Kenvin. Apartment Management Consultants, LLC waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Rosenberg, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laura Sklarsky, Susan Cook, Natalie Kenvin. Standard Maple Owner, LLC waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Rosenberg, Mary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
June 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Susan Cook, Natalie Kenvin, Laura Sklarsky by Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Mary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosenberg, Mary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laura Sklarsky, Susan Cook, Natalie Kenvin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15886832. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Rosenberg, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sklarsky et al v. Indigo Real Estate Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Kenvin
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cook
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Sklarsky
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Maple Owner, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment Management Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indigo Real Estate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?