Meridian Leasing Corporation v. Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Plaintiff: Meridian Leasing Corporation
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03723
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation(Esbrook, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Parties' joint stipulation and motion for extension of time to answer and otherwise plead #8 is granted to 7/29/19. Parties' MIDP responses shall be served by 8/28/19. Motion hearing date of 7/2/19 is stricken. Status hearing previously set for 8/13/19 is stricken and reset to 9/10/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Parties' joint stipulation and motion for extension of time to answer and otherwise plead #8 is granted to 7/29/19. Parties' MIDP responses shall be served by 8/28/19. Motion hearing date of 7/2/19 is stricken. Status hearing previously set for 8/13/19 is stricken and reset to 9/10/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr for presentment of Motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline #8 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kozlowski, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Corporation by Christopher J. Esbrook (Esbrook, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's R. 7.1 and LR 3.2 Disclosure Statement) (Kozlowski, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Corporation by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr (Kozlowski, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 8/13/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Corporation (pj, )
June 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Meridian Leasing Corporation by Katherine A. Grosh (Grosh, Katherine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Meridian Leasing Corporation by Howard L. Teplinsky (Teplinsky, Howard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Teplinsky, Howard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Meridian Leasing Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15892754. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Teplinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meridian Leasing Corporation v. Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Esbrook
Represented By: Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridian Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Howard L. Teplinsky
Represented By: Katherine A. Grosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?