United States v. Tidwell
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Defendant: Wayman O Tidwell
Case Number: 1:2019cv03735
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 8/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant is given until the next status hearing to obtain counsel and to have him or her file their appearance on the docket, and appear at the next status hearing. If defendant does not obtain counsel by that date, he shall appear at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS Report by United States (Stallings, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States (Stallings, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States as to Wayman O Tidwell on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Stallings, Mary)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wayman O Tidwell (pj, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
June 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayman O Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?