Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-23
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-23
Case Number: 1:2019cv03799
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 1 (Hierl, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. Motion presentment hearing set for 6/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/18/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. in support of motion for discovery #7 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ph, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905058. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?