Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-16
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-16, Doe 1, Doe 5, Doe 4, Doe 3, Doe 2 and Doe 6
Case Number: 1:2019cv03801
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #12 , Doe Defendants 1 and 6 are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Courts homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 9/19/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 9/12/19 using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery #8 is granted. Such early discovery is generally allowed only under limited circumstances. See, e.g., Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d); Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Does 1-28, No. 14 C 4927, 2014 WL 3642163, at *2 (N.D. Ill. July 22, 2014). Here, the Court finds that good cause exists to allow plaintiff to obtain discovery prior to the conference. Plaintiff may cause to be issued subpoenas to the ISP(s) that provided internet service to the defendant identified by the referenced IP address in order to obtain information regarding that defendant's name and address. This order is without prejudice to the defendant or ISP(s) moving to quash the subpoena on any available ground. the 6/20/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery #8 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/20/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. in support of motion for discovery #8 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jjr, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (jjr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905114. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?