Baker v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Deon Baker
Defendant: J M Kostanski, R Ruiz, City of Chicago, a municipal corporation, L C Gonzalez, G J Young, C J Doles and Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv03809
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In its reply in support of its motion to stay, Defendant City of Chicago shall address, among any other issues it chooses to discuss, how the pending state criminal charges against Plaintiff stem from or are related to the April 30, 2017 incident, in which Plaintiff alleges that police officers stopped and searched Plaintiff, but subsequently released him after finding no warrants for his arrest. Mailed notice (is, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Cierra Norris for presentment of before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/31/2019 at 12:00 PM. (Norris, Cierra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Deon Bakerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs to stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Underlying Criminal Proceedings #7 (Norris, Cierra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Deon Bakerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs to stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Underlying Criminal Proceedings #7 (Norris, Cierra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notices of motion #27 , and #28 are stricken given that the Court has already set a briefing schedule on the motion to stay. Mailed notice (is, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Cierra Norris for presentment of before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/31/2019 at 12:00 PM. (Norris, Cierra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Cierra Norris for presentment of before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM. (Norris, Cierra)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Deon Baker in Opposition to motion to stay #7 (Norris, Cierra)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #7 #8 #9 #10 sent to Attorney Cierra Norris returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Cierra Norris a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendants Gonzalez, Ruiz, Doles, Young, and Kostanski's motion to join Defendant City of Chicago's motion to stay proceedings pending the outcome of the underlying criminal proceedings #22 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 7/23/2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford for presentment of motion to join #22 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hanford, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants C J Doles, L C Gonzalez, J M Kostanski, R Ruiz, G J Young to join Defendant City of Chicago's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Underlying Criminal Proceedings (Hanford, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants C J Doles, L C Gonzalez, J M Kostanski, R Ruiz, G J Young by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford (Hanford, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs by Marques Alan Berrington (Berrington, Marques)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 7/11/2019. The briefing schedule as to Defendant City of Chicago's motion to stay proceeding pending the outcome of the underlying criminal proceedings #7 is as follows: Plaintiff's response due by 8/1/2019. Reply due by 8/15/2019. Ruling will be made by electronic notice. Status hearing set for 8/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (is, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Gold's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for City of Chicago #16 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 7/16/2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Attorney Melissa Freddi Gold terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Freddi Gold for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #16 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gold, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Melissa Freddi Gold to withdraw as attorney for Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs. No party information provided (Gold, Melissa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Cierra Norris' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #12 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (is, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deon Baker by Christopher Wright. (mma, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 7/2/2019. Defendant City of Chicago's motion to stay proceedings pending the outcome of the underlying criminal proceedings #7 is entered and continued. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15972628. 2019-CV-03809 (Norris, Cierra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing noticed for 6/18/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion as to Defendant City of Chicago's motion to stay #7 . Mailed notice (is, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs by Cheryl Lynne Friedman (Friedman, Cheryl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs by Melissa Freddi Gold (Gold, Melissa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Katherine Mcclelland for presentment of motion to stay #7 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mcclelland, Mary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs to stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Underlying Criminal Proceedings (Mcclelland, Mary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 8/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Attorney Cierra Norris. (jh, )
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mcclelland, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation by Mary Katherine Mcclelland (Mcclelland, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L004694) filed by City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice & Complaint))(Mcclelland, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Kostanski
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Ruiz
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, a municipal corporation
Represented By: Mary Katherine Mcclelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L C Gonzalez
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Young
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Doles
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department's Bureau of Internal Affairs
Represented By: Mary Katherine Mcclelland
Represented By: Melissa Freddi Gold
Represented By: Marques Alan Berrington
Represented By: Cheryl Lynne Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Baker
Represented By: Christopher Wright
Represented By: Cierra Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?