Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Defendant: Felipe Nery Gomez, Athur James Muellman Gomez and Arthur James Muellman Gomez
Case Number: 1:2019cv03833
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schmeltz, Vincent)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Schmeltz, Vincent)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by All Defendants re order #8 of Filing of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Felipe Gomez, Esq. per 6.18.19 Ex Parte Executive Committee Order of Suspension (Gomez, Felipe)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Felipe Nery Gomez re order #8 of Attached Motion to EC to Vacate or Stay 6.18.19 Summary Order of Suspension (Gomez, Felipe)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/18/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Felipe Nery Gomez re complaint #1 of FIling of Pro Se Motion in 19cv0827 to Consolidate 19cv3833 into 19cv0827 (Gomez, Felipe)
June 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Felipe Nery Gomez by Felipe N Gomez Appearing Pro Se Only For Himself Pending Retention of Counsel (Gomez, Felipe)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Joint status report due by 8/9/2019. Status hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/13/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Arthur James Muellman Gomez, Felipe Nery Gomez. (kb, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III (Schmeltz, Vincent)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schmeltz, Vincent)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Interpleader filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15907720. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Schmeltz, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Nery Gomez
Represented By: Felipe N Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athur James Muellman Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur James Muellman Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?