O'Donnell v. Walgreens Company
Plaintiff: Geraldine O'Donnell
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03903
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 9/10/2019. Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Initial Status hearing reset for 9/24/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 8/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 (Joint) NOTICE of Motion by Katherine A. Manuel for presentment of extension of time, motion to reset #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Manuel, Katherine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Walgreens Company for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, MOTION by Defendant Walgreens Company to reset Initial Status Hearing (Joint) (Manuel, Katherine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreens Company by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreens Company by Katherine A. Manuel (Manuel, Katherine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Geraldine O'Donnell. All Defendants. (Wood, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Geraldine O'Donnell by Lisa L Clay (Clay, Lisa)
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Geraldine O'Donnell by James Bryan Wood (Wood, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wood, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Geraldine O'Donnell by Ryan Odell Estes (Estes, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Geraldine O'Donnell; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15916937.(Estes, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donnell v. Walgreens Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine O'Donnell
Represented By: Ryan Odell Estes
Represented By: James Bryan Wood
Represented By: Lisa L Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Represented By: Michael Vincent Furlong
Represented By: Katherine A. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?