Clayton v. Autozone, Inc.
Plaintiff: Indra V Clayton
Defendant: Autozone, Inc. and Autozoners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03909
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 8/12/19 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 9/24/19 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the courts Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Autozoners, LLC by Beverly Pazon Alfon (Alfon, Beverly)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Indra V Clayton. Autozoners, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Salzer, Abby)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by Indra V Clayton against Autozoners, LLC and terminating Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Salzer, Abby)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Indra V Clayton by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Indra V Clayton by Abby Dritz Salzer (Salzer, Abby)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Salzer, Abby)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Indra V Clayton; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15917639. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Salzer, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indra V Clayton
Represented By: Abby Dritz Salzer
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozoners, LLC
Represented By: Beverly Pazon Alfon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?