Young v. Granite Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Young
Defendant: Kenny Construction Company and Granite Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03922
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Michael Young in Opposition to motion to compel,, motion to strike, #19 (Werman, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 8/15/19 is stricken. The 10/16/19 status hearing date will stand. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 7/10/19. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration on an individual basis and in the alternative to strike Plaintiff's jury demand #19 is due by 7/31/19; reply due by 8/14/19. Defendant's motion to defer filing their answer and affirmative defenses to Plaintiff's complaint pending resolution of their motion to compel arbitration #21 is granted. This case is stayed until the ruling on the motion to compel arbitration is decided. Status hearing set for 10/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company (Koehler, Renee)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Melissa Gomberg Dinkel for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #21 , motion to compel,, motion to strike, #19 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction CompanyMotion to Defer Filing of Defendants' Answer And Affirmative Defenses Pending Resolution of their Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company in support of motion to compel,, motion to strike, #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company to compel arbitration on an individual basis and, in the alternative,, MOTION by Defendants Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company to strike Plaintiff's jury demand (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kenny Construction Company by Stephanie Melissa Gomberg Dinkel (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Granite Construction, Inc. by Stephanie Melissa Gomberg Dinkel (Dinkel, Stephanie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kenny Construction Company by Renee L. Koehler (Koehler, Renee)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Granite Construction, Inc. by Renee L. Koehler (Koehler, Renee)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Michael Young (Josephson, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Michael Young (Schreiber, Richard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Michael Young (Salas, Maureen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project by Michael Young (Werman, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Young as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Executed Return - Kenny Construction)(Schreiber, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 8/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Michael Young of Filing Notices of Consent (Josephson, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Granite Construction, Inc., Kenny Construction Company (pj, )
June 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Young by Richard Schreiber (Schreiber, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Young by Michael A. Josephson (Josephson, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Young by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Young by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Young; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15918809. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Werman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Granite Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Construction Company
Represented By: Stephanie Melissa Gomberg Dinkel
Represented By: Renee L. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Melissa Gomberg Dinkel
Represented By: Renee L. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Young
Represented By: Maureen Ann Salas
Represented By: Richard Schreiber
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?