Jett v. Manchester Knolls Cooperative et al
Plaintiff: Shuronda Jett
Defendant: Price Chris, KIRKPATRICK MANAGEMENT COMPANY and Manchester Knolls Cooperative
Case Number: 1:2019cv03936
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Settlement conference is set for 10/01/19 at 1:30 p.m. The settlement conference will be held in the Courtroom, Room #1843. The settlement conference will be conducted in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Instructions for Settlement Conference, which is enclosed and which can also be accessed from the Court's webpage at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?EBclBxz8ceU=. The schedule for exchange of settlement letters required by the Standing Order is as follows: plaintiff's counsel shall serve a settlement letter on defense counsel by 08/26/19, and defendants' counsel shall serve a settlement letter on plaintiff's counsel by 09/16/19. The parties may not change these dates for exchange without either written agreement of the parties or Court order. Defense counsel shall deliver all copies of the settlement letters to chambers by noon on 09/17/19. The parties may not change this date absent Court order. Parties with "full and complete settlement authority," as defined in the Standing Order, must personally attend the conference. The parties who attend the conference shall read all settlement letters prior to the commencement of the conference. Failure to comply with the Standing Order or with the schedule set in this order may result in sanctions. (For further details see order(s) attached). Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 8/6/2019. Mailed notice. (dal, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for extension of time to 7/31/2019 to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(srn, )Mailed notice.
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Answer by Kirkpatrick Management Company, Manchester Knolls Cooperative to (Pinzur, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Kirkpatrick Management Company, Manchester Knolls Cooperative for extension of time to file answer (Pinzur, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shuronda Jett as to Kirkpatrick Management Company on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Manchester Knolls Cooperative on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Norman Washington, Maudia)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kirkpatrick Management Company, Manchester Knolls Cooperative by Robert Stuart Pinzur (Pinzur, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Manchester Knolls Cooperative (pj, )
June 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 (rc, ).
June 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Norman Washington, Maudia)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shuronda Jett; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15921374.(Norman Washington, Maudia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jett v. Manchester Knolls Cooperative et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRKPATRICK MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Stuart Pinzur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Knolls Cooperative
Represented By: Robert Stuart Pinzur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuronda Jett
Represented By: Maudia Diana Victorian Norman Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?