Pass v. American Precision Castings Group, Inc., an Illinois Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Pass
Defendant: ABC Hammers, Inc., an Illinois Corporation, Jonathan Kieft, individually, American Precision Castings Group, Inc., an Illinois Corporation, American Precision Castings Group, Inc., Jonathan Kieft and ABC Hammers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03943
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report by John Pass (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Engelson, Samuel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Jonathan Kieft(Giampietro, Wayne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ABC Hammers, Inc., American Precision Castings Group, Inc., Jonathan Kieft by Wayne B. Giampietro (Giampietro, Wayne)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 7/29/2019 #5 is stricken and re-set for 8/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Pass. ABC Hammers, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; American Precision Castings Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Pass as to Jonathan Kieft on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Pass by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jonathan Kieft (pj, )
June 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Pass by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JOHN PASS v. AMERICAN PRECISION CASTINGS GROUP, INC., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION, ABC HAMMERS, INC., AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION, AND JONATHAN KIEFT, INDIVIDUALLY filed by John Pass; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15922335. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pass v. American Precision Castings Group, Inc., an Illinois Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Hammers, Inc., an Illinois Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kieft, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Precision Castings Group, Inc., an Illinois Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Precision Castings Group, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne B. Giampietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kieft
Represented By: Wayne B. Giampietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Hammers, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne B. Giampietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pass
Represented By: John William Billhorn
Represented By: Samuel David Engelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?