Saud v. DePaul University et al
Plaintiff: Laith Saud
Defendant: Marla Morgen, DePaul University and Karen Tamburro
Case Number: 1:2019cv03945
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Brian P Paul for presentment of motion to dismiss #19 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/15/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Paul, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro in support of motion to dismiss #19 Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-5A)(Paul, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro, DePaul University to dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike (Paul, Brian)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Laith Saud re amended complaint #17 (Abraham, Christina)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 First AMENDED complaint by Laith Saud against All Defendants (Abraham, Christina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro by Michael Kim Chropowicz (Chropowicz, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff is given leave to file an amended complaint by 7/19/2019. Defendants are given to and including 8/9/2019 to file responsive pleading. Defendants motion to dismiss #12 is stricken without prejudice. Initial status hearing set for 7/23/2019 is reset to 8/15/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Joint status report is now due 8/13/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Brian P Paul for presentment of motion to dismiss #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Paul, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro in support of motion to dismiss #12 Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-6A)(Paul, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro, DePaul University to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Paul, Brian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro by Sara Reed Whaley (Whaley, Sara)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro by Kerryann Marie Haase (Haase, Kerryann)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro by Brian P Paul (Paul, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Laith Saud regarding Affidavit of Process Server served on Defendant Marla Morgen on 6/15/2019 (Abraham, Christina)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Laith Saud regarding Affidavit of Process Server served on Defendant DePaul University on 6/19/2019 (Abraham, Christina)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Laith Saud regarding Proof of Service served on Defendant Karen Tamburro on 6/18/2019 (Abraham, Christina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants DePaul University, Marla Morgen, Karen Tamburro (rc, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
June 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Laith Saud by Christina W. Abraham (Abraham, Christina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abraham, Christina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laith Saud; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15922654.(Abraham, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saud v. DePaul University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Morgen
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Sara Reed Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePaul University
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Sara Reed Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Tamburro
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Sara Reed Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laith Saud
Represented By: Christina W. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?