Malec v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Malec
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc. and Joseph Phelan
Case Number: 1:2019cv03966
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint #9 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, July 12, 2019. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 9/11/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Malec by Haley Renee Jenkins (Jenkins, Haley)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Vincent Furlong for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/12/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Furlong, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan for extension of time to file answer - DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - (Furlong, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael H. Cramer (Cramer, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Malec as to Joseph Phelan on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Zouras, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Malec as to Guaranteed Rate, Inc. on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Zouras, James)
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan (daj, )
June 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Malec by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Malec; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15925659. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zouras, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malec v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Cramer
Represented By: Michael Vincent Furlong
Represented By: Michael D. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Phelan
Represented By: Michael H. Cramer
Represented By: Michael Vincent Furlong
Represented By: Michael D. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Malec
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Haley Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?