Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois et al v. Industrial Services Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Bratek and Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois
Defendant: Industrial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03982
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 08/05/2019:Emailed notice(slb, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held on Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and for and Order directing Defendant to turn over monthly benefit contribution reports #8 . Plaintiffs have properly completed service of process on Defendant, Defendant has not answered, and the time for answering the Complaint has expired. The Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default #8 and turn over order is granted. The order shall be entered in a separate entry. Status hearing set for 09/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant's counsel may appear by telephone for the status hearing by contacting the courtroom deputy, Ms. Sandra Brooks (312.408.5121), with a contact phone number the day before the hearing. Emailed notice (slb, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial by David Bratek, Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois (Scanlon, Cecilia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of David Bratek regarding motion for entry of default,, motion for order, #8 (Scanlon, Cecilia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Cecilia M. Scanlon for presentment of motion for entry of default,, motion for order, #8 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs David Bratek, Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiffs David Bratek, Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois for order directing Defendant to turn over monthly fringe benefit contribution reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Scanlon, Cecilia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the status hearing at 8:30 a.m. is reset to 9 a.m on the same date, 08/05/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois, David Bratek as to Industrial Services Group, Inc. on 6/23/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 08/05/2019 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Industrial Services Group, Inc. (daj, )
June 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Bratek, Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois by Catherine Marie Chapman (Chapman, Catherine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Bratek, Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois, David Bratek; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15927802. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scanlon, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois et al v. Industrial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bratek
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Fringe Benefit Funds Of Illinois
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?