Cabrera-Puyot v. Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Cabrera-Puyot
Defendant: Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04007
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sharon Cabrera-Puyot Without Prejudice (Hijazin, Majdi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Tameika L. Montgomery (Montgomery, Tameika)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Misty L. Peterson (Peterson, Misty)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Lewis, Rodney)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer - UNOPPOSED (Lewis, Rodney)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Lewis, Rodney)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In light of the Defendants answers due on 7/31/2019, the initial status hearing set for 7/24/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report is now due on 8/13/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Cabrera-Puyot as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Cabrera-Puyot as to Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Hijazin, Majdi)
June 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC (ec, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/24/2019 at 9:15 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharon Cabrera-Puyot by Majdi Y. Hijazin (Hijazin, Majdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharon Cabrera-Puyot; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15931032. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hijazin, Majdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera-Puyot v. Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draper and Kramer Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Curry
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Represented By: Rodney L. Lewis
Represented By: Tameika L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cabrera-Puyot
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?