Loughran et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Loughran and Margaret Loughran
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Mayer Brown LLP, Pierce & Associates P.C., WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Does and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04023
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/27/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for class certification #26 is entered and continued. Wells Fargo's motion to defer ruling on Plaintiff's motion to certify class action #31 is granted. Wells Fargo & Companys and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s motion to leave to exceed page limit #37 is granted. Motion hearing set for 8/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to response in opposition to motion #36 , MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to defer Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Action #31 (Webber, Charles)
July 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Luis Eduardo Quinones Fernandez for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #37 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Quinones Fernandez, Luis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for leave to file excess pages (Quinones Fernandez, Luis)
July 26, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughranin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to defer Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Action #31 (Smith, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran as to Pierce & Associates P.C. on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Smith, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 11, 2019 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 35450. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 RE- NOTICE of Motion by John P Smith for presentment of motion to certify class #28 , motion to certify class #27 , motion to certify class #26 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Frederick Webber for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #31 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Webber, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to defer Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class Action (Webber, Charles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Order entered on 7/11/2019 #29 , is amended as follows: Defendants Wells Fargo & Company's and Fargo Bank N.A. d/b/a Wells Fargo Home Mortgage's motion for extension of time to file a response to amended complaint #14 and Law firm defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to amended class action complaint by 8/13/2019 #21 are granted. Motion hearing set for 7/30/2019 is stricken. Other than the amendment stated in this order, the order previously entered shall stand. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Law firm defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to amended class action complaint by 8/13/2019 #21 is granted. Status hearing held and continued to 8/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran to certify class NOTICE OF MOTION July 18, 2019 Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Smith, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiffs Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran to certify class Memo of Law in Support of Motion Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Smith, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiffs Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran to certify class Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Smith, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughranin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for extension of time to File a Response to Amended Complaint #14 (Smith, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mayer Brown LLP by Lauren Rachel Noll (Noll, Lauren)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mayer Brown LLP by Michael Hercules Bornhorst (Bornhorst, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Stanley Marovitz for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Marovitz, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown LLP, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Pierce & Associates P.C. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #5 (Marovitz, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mayer Brown LLP by Andrew Stanley Marovitz (Marovitz, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Pierce & Associates P.C. re attorney appearance #18 , attorney appearance #17 (Merfeld, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pierce & Associates P.C. by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran as to McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Smith, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Luis Eduardo Quinones Fernandez for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Quinones Fernandez, Luis)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for extension of time to File a Response to Amended Complaint (Quinones Fernandez, Luis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service Notice of 7/2/19 Minute Entry Status Hearing 8/13/2019 at 9:30 AM by John P Smith on behalf of Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran regarding set/reset hearings,,,,, #9 (Smith, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Charles Frederick Webber (Webber, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Colby Anne Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Colby)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Luis Eduardo Quinones Fernandez (Quinones Fernandez, Luis)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/13/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran as to Mayer Brown LLP on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Smith, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Smith, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran regarding Affidavit of Service served on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 06/24/2019 (Smith, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 15(a)(1)(A) AMENDED complaint by Daniel Loughran, Margaret Loughran against All Plaintiffs (Smith, John)
June 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mayer Brown LLP, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Pierce & Associates P.C., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (yt)
June 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
June 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel Loughran by John P Smith (Smith, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Loughran; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15933124.(Smith, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loughran et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayer Brown LLP
Represented By: Michael Hercules Bornhorst
Represented By: Lauren Rachel Noll
Represented By: Andrew Stanley Marovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce & Associates P.C.
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Charles Frederick Webber
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Luis Eduardo Quinones Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Charles Frederick Webber
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Luis Eduardo Quinones Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Loughran
Represented By: John P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Loughran
Represented By: John P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?