Ippolito et al v. Sallie Mae Bank et al
Plaintiff: Caitlin Ippolito and Nicholas Ippolito
Defendant: Sallie Mae Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv04056
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sallie Mae Bank. (Lowry, Ryan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. Experian must respond to the complaint by 8/18/19. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing remains set for 9/6/19 at 9:30 a.m., with an initial status report due three days prior. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED in error. Modified on 7/22/2019 (psm, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Adam Hall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hall, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Hall, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc by Christopher Adam Hall (Hall, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caitlin Ippolito, Nicholas Ippolito as to Sallie Mae Bank on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caitlin Ippolito, Nicholas Ippolito as to Experian Information Solutions Inc on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caitlin Ippolito, Nicholas Ippolito as to Equifax Information Services LLC on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Sallie Mae Bank (lma, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 9/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
June 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Caitlin Ippolito, Nicholas Ippolito by Alexander John Mikulaschek (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Caitlin Ippolito, Nicholas Ippolito; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15936940. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Credit Report, #3 Exhibit Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit Credit Report)(Mikulaschek, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ippolito et al v. Sallie Mae Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Ippolito
Represented By: Alexander John Mikulaschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ippolito
Represented By: Alexander John Mikulaschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Christopher Adam Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?