McCurry v. MARS et al
Plaintiff: Edith McCurry
Defendant: MARS, Kenco Logistics Services, LLC, The Reed Group, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Dr Koehler
Case Number: 1:2019cv04067
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kenco Logistics Services, LLC, Dr Koehler, MARS, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Reed Group to United States Marshal's for Service via e-mail. (smm, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT filed by Edith McCurry. (smm, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status hearing held on 7/19/2019. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to issue summons for service by the U.S. Marshal Service. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each defendant being served, if she has not done so. The motion for attorney representation #7 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is referred to the Hibbler Help Desk. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/19/2019. Mailed notice (smm, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #7 is set for 7/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED 5 service copies of the complaint by Edith McCurry. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Edith McCurry for attorney representation. (nsf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Edith McCurry for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (nsf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Edith McCurry. (nsf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Edith McCurry. (Exhibits) (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurry v. MARS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenco Logistics Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reed Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?