Nichols v. Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust
Appellee: Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust
Appellant: Tijuana L. Nichols
Case Number: 1:2019cv04100
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY by Appellee Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust Trustee's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Appeal (Barbakoff, Gregg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Defendant/Appellant Tijuana L. Nichols in opposition to Turstee's motion to dismiss appeal; Notice. (aee, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 7/3/19. Briefing schedule on motion to dismiss #5 : Plaintiff's response is due by 7/24/19; Defendant's reply is due by 8/7/19. Next status date set for 9/24/19 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust by Jeffrey Thomas Karek (Karek, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Gregg M. Barbakoff for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Barbakoff, Gregg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Appellee Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barbakoff, Gregg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust by Gregg M. Barbakoff (Barbakoff, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (aee, )
June 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION by Appellant Tijuana L. Nichols for leave to appeal (USBC-Ross, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 35004 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Karek
Represented By: Gregg M. Barbakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tijuana L. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?