Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.228.233.120 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04102
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Closing Minute Entry dated 7/11/2019)(jh, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Plaintiff may serve a third party subpoena on the internet service provider commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Once Plaintiff receives the information, Plaintiff should provide the Defendant with a copy of this minute order. Upon receipt of the minute order, the Defendant may file a motion for protective order requesting that the identification information not be disclosed. Such a motion must be filed within 30 days of Defendant's receipt of this order. If such a motion is not filed within that time, the information will no longer remain confidential. This case is closed for administrative purposes subject to reinstatement upon filing an amended complaint. Status hearing set for 8/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on 6/27/19. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE MIDP complaince (Schulz, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for leave to serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference #6 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/25/2019 (jh, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC for leave to serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/25/2019 (jh, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC for leave to serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/25/2019 (jh, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jh, )
June 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15943626. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 98.228.233.120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?