Lara v. Siemens Industry, Inc.

Plaintiff: Frank Lara
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04145
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Frank Lara against Siemens Industry, Inc. (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #11 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 8/8/19. Defendant's responsive pleading is due 9/9/19. If the responsive pleading is a motion to dismiss, no notice of presentment is necessary. Plaintiff's response is due 9/30/19; defendant's reply 10/21/19. The previous motion to dismiss #6 and the accompanying briefing schedule are terminated as moot. Status hearing on 9/12/19 is stricken and reset to 10/30/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Jeffrey R. Kulwin on behalf of Frank Lara (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey R. Kulwin for presentment of motion for leave to file #11 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/24/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Frank Lara for leave to file Amended Complaint (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff does not appear. The briefing schedule on defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 7/18/19; defendant's reply 8/8/19. Discovery pursuant to the MIDP is stayed. Rule 26 initial disclosures as to Count III of the complaint must be exchanged by 8/8/19, and the parties may propound written discovery as to Count III. Continued status hearing is set for 9/12/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth N. Hall for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/27/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Siemens Industry, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 (Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. [Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint] (Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Siemens Industry, Inc.(Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. by Grace Lauren Urban (Urban, Grace)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. by Elizabeth N. Hall (Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hall, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, case number (2019-L-005179) filed by Siemens Industry, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15949707. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hall, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Siemens Industry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Hall
Represented By: Grace Lauren Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lara
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Kulwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?