Durns v. Family Guidance Centers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Curtis L. Durns
Defendant: Family Guidance Centers, Inc. f/k/a Specialized Assistance Services, NFP and Family Guidance Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04154
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Curtis L. Durns. Family Guidance Centers, Inc. waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Martoccio, Gary)
June 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Family Guidance Centers, Inc. (lw, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Curtis L. Durns by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Curtis L. Durns; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15951394. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durns v. Family Guidance Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L. Durns
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Guidance Centers, Inc. f/k/a Specialized Assistance Services, NFP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Guidance Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?