Landstar Ranger, Inc. v. Triple A Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Defendant: Triple A Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04201
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by David L. LaPorte for presentment of motion for default judgment #7 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (LaPorte, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Landstar Ranger, Inc. for default judgment as to Triple A Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Damages)(LaPorte, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. as to Triple A Logistics, Inc. on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (LaPorte, David)
July 17, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Triple A Logistics, Inc.. (lw, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Landstar Ranger, Inc. as to Triple A Logistics, Inc.. (LaPorte, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Triple A Logistics, Inc. (rc, )
June 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landstar Ranger, Inc. by David L. LaPorte (LaPorte, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (LaPorte, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15957633. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaPorte, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landstar Ranger, Inc. v. Triple A Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Represented By: David L. LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?